Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 15-1483
No. 15-1483
Title:
Tarsadia Hotels, et al., Petitioners
v.
Dean Beaver, et al.
Docketed:June 10, 2016
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(15-55106)
  Decision Date:March 10, 2016

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Jun 8 2016 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 11, 2016)
Jul 8 2016 Waiver of right of respondents Dean Beaver, et al. to respond filed.
Jul 20 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 26, 2016.
Oct 3 2016 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioners:
Michael M. Berger Manatt, Phelps & Phillips LLP(310) 312-4000
    Counsel of Record11355 West Olympic Boulevard
Los Angeles, CA  90064
mmberger@manatt.com
Party name: Tarsadia Hotels, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents:
Michael Schrag Gibbs Law Group, LLC(510) 350-9718
    Counsel of Record 505 14th Street
Oakland, CA  94612
mis@classlawgroup.com
Party name: Dean Beaver, et al.
July 28, 2017 | Version 2014.2