Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 15-1456
No. 15-1456
Title:
Samim Anghaie, et ux., Petitioners
v.
United States
Docketed:June 3, 2016
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
  Case Nos.:(15-10454)
  Decision Date:November 30, 2015
  Rehearing Denied:February 1, 2016

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Apr 22 2016 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 5, 2016)
Jun 21 2016 Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Jun 29 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 26, 2016.
Jul 21 2016 Response Requested . (Due August 22, 2016)
Aug 4 2016 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including September 21, 2016.
Sep 21 2016 Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Sep 30 2016 Reply of petitioners Samim Anghaie, et ux. filed.
Oct 5 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 28, 2016.
Oct 31 2016 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioners:
Samim Anghaie 3027 NW 58th Blvd.(352) 371-6016
Gainesville, FL  32606
Party name: Samim Anghaie, et ux.
Attorneys for Respondent:
Ian Heath Gershengorn Acting Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
    Counsel of Record United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543