Docket for 15-1369
No. 15-1369 | |
Title: |
Newegg Inc., Petitioner |
v. |
MacroSolve, Inc. |
|
Docketed: | May 11, 2016 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (2015-1642) |
Decision Date: | February 9, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
May 9 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 10, 2016) |
May 16 2016 |
Waiver of right of respondent MacroSolve, Inc. to respond filed. |
May 24 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 9, 2016. |
May 26 2016 |
Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or neither party, received from counsel for petitioner. |
May 27 2016 |
Brief amici curiae of Atlantic Legal Foundation, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Jun 13 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |
|