Docket for 15-1294
No. 15-1294 | |
Vide 11-1136 | |
Title: |
Lava Marie Haugen, Petitioner |
v. |
United States |
|
Docketed: | April 20, 2016 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (14-2987) |
Decision Date: | January 14, 2016 |
Rehearing Denied: | March 10, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Apr 15 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 20, 2016) |
May 13 2016 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including June 20, 2016. |
Jun 20 2016 |
Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. |
Jul 6 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 26, 2016. |
Oct 3 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 7, 2016. |
Oct 11 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |
|