Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results

Docket for 15-1168
No. 15-1168
Michelle Rye, et vir, Petitioners
Women's Care Center of Memphis, MPLLC, et al.
Docketed:March 17, 2016
Linked with 15A751
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Tennessee, Eastern Division
  Case Nos.:(W2013-00804-SC-R11-CV)
  Decision Date:October 26, 2015

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Jan 14 2016 Application (15A751) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 24, 2016 to March 15, 2016, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Jan 19 2016 Application (15A751) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until March 15, 2016.
Mar 15 2016 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 18, 2016)
Apr 18 2016 Brief of respondents Women's Care Center of Memphis, MPLLC, et al. in opposition filed.
May 2 2016 Reply of petitioners Michelle Rye, et vir filed.
May 3 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 19, 2016.
May 23 2016 Petition DENIED.

~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioners:
Gary K. Smith 1770 Kirby Parkway(901) 308-6484
    Counsel of RecordSuite 427
Memphis, TN  38138
Party name: Michelle Rye, et vir
Attorneys for Respondents:
William Howard Haltom Jr. Lewis, Thomason, King, Krieg & Waldrop, P.C.(901) 525-8721
    Counsel of Record2900 One Commerce Square, 40 South Main Sstreet
Memphis, TN  38103
Party name: Women's Care Center of Memphis, MPLLC, et al.


SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543