Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 15-1101
No. 15-1101
Title:
Google, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Pulaski & Middleman, LLC, et al.
Docketed:March 2, 2016
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(12-16752)
  Decision Date:September 21, 2015
  Rehearing Denied:December 8, 2015

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Mar 1 2016 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 1, 2016)
Mar 16 2016 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for petitioner.
Mar 23 2016 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for respondents.
Mar 29 2016 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including May 2, 2016.
Apr 1 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Intel Corporation filed.
Apr 1 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed.
May 2 2016 Brief of respondents Pulaski & Middleman, LLC, et al. in opposition filed.
May 16 2016 Reply of petitioner Google, Inc. filed.
May 17 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 2, 2016.
Jun 6 2016 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Neal Kumar Katyal Hogan Lovells US LLP(202) 637-6000
    Counsel of Record555 Thirteenth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20004
neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com
Party name: Google, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents:
Noah Michael Schubert Schubert Johckheer & Kolbe LLP(415) 788-4220
    Counsel of RecordThree Embarcadero Center
Suite 1650
San Francisco, CA  94111
nschubert@sjk.law
Party name: Pulaski & Middleman, LLC, et al.
Other:
Deborah J. La Fetra Pacific Legal Foundation(916) 419-7111
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA  95814
dlafetra@pacificlegal.org
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation
 
Eric D. Miller Perkins Coie LLP(206) 359-8000
1201 Third Avenue
Suite 4900
Seattle, WA  98101
emiller@perkinscoie.com
Party name: Intel Corporation
April 26, 2017 | Version 2014.2