Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 15-1062
No. 15-1062
Title:
Hemopet, Petitioner
v.
Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.
Docketed:February 23, 2016
Linked with 15A536
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
  Case Nos.:(2015-1218)
  Decision Date:September 21, 2015

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Nov 10 2015 Application (15A536) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 20, 2015 to February 18, 2016, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Nov 20 2015 Application (15A536) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until February 18, 2016.
Feb 18 2016 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 24, 2016)
Feb 25 2016 Waiver of right of respondent Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. to respond filed.
Mar 23 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 15, 2016.
Apr 18 2016 Petition DENIED.
May 13 2016 Petition for Rehearing filed.
May 24 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 9, 2016.
Jun 13 2016 Rehearing DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Erik S. Jaffe Erik S. Jaffe, P.C.(202) 237-8165
5101 34th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20008
jaffe@esjpc.com
Party name: Hemopet
Attorneys for Respondent:
Bryan S. Hales Kirkland & Ellis, LLP(312) 862-2000
    Counsel of Record300 North LaSalle Street
Chicago, IL  60654
bryan.hales@kirkland.com
Party name: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543