Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 15-1030
No. 15-1030
Title:
June Shew, et al., Petitioners
v.
Dannel P. Malloy, Governor of Connecticut, et al.
Docketed:February 16, 2016
Linked with 15A647
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
  Case Nos.:(14-319)
  Decision Date:October 19, 2015

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Dec 15 2015 Application (15A647) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 17, 2016 to February 18, 2016, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
Dec 18 2015 Application (15A647) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until February 18, 2016.
Feb 11 2016 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 17, 2016)
Feb 29 2016 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the petitioners.
Mar 7 2016 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including May 16, 2016.
Mar 15 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Second Amendment Coalition filed.
May 16 2016 Brief of respondents Dannel P. Malloy, Governor of Connecticut, et al. in opposition filed.
May 27 2016 Reply of petitioners June Shew, et al. filed.
May 31 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 16, 2016.
Jun 20 2016 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioners:
David H. Thompson Cooper & Kirk, PLLC(202) 220-9600
    Counsel of Record1523 New Hampshire Avenue, NW
Washington, DC  20036
Party name: June Shew, Et al.
Attorneys for Respondents:
Maura Bridget Murphy Osborne Office of the Attorney General860-808-5020
    Counsel of Record55 Elm Street, P.O. Box 120
Hartford, CT  06141-0120
Maura.MurphyOsborne@ct.gov
Party name: Dannel P. Malloy, Governor of Connecticut, et al.
Other:
Paloma A. Capanna 633 Lake Road (585) 377-7260
Webster, NY  14580
paloma@law-policy.com
Party name: Second Amendment Coalition
March 27, 2017 | Version 2014.2