Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 15-1028
No. 15-1028
Title:
Cosmo Fazio, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:February 16, 2016
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
  Case Nos.:(13-3111)
  Decision Date:August 4, 2015
  Rehearing Denied:November 12, 2015

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Feb 10 2016 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 17, 2016)
Feb 24 2016 Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Mar 2 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 18, 2016.
Mar 15 2016 Response Requested . (Due April 14, 2016)
Apr 8 2016 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including May 16, 2016.
May 16 2016 Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
May 31 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 16, 2016.
May 31 2016 Reply of petitioner Cosmo Fazio filed. (Distributed)
Jun 20 2016 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
E. Joshua Rosenkranz Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP(212) 506-5380
    Counsel of Record51 West 52nd Street
New York, NY  10019-6142
jrosenkranz@orrick.com
Party name: Cosmo Fazio
 
Mark A. Goldstein Goldstein and Associates, LLC(412) 258-8080
1125 Penn Avenue, 3rd Floor
Pittsburgh, PA  15222
mgoldstein@mglaw.com
Party name: Cosmo Fazio
Attorneys for Respondent:
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
    Counsel of Record United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: United States
March 25, 2017 | Version 2014.2