Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 15-1013
No. 15-1013
Title:
Philip Morris USA Inc., Petitioner
v.
Paul Scott Schwarz, Personal Representative of the Estate of Michelle Schwarz
Docketed:February 10, 2016
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Oregon
  Case Nos.:(A152354)
  Decision Date:July 15, 2015
Discretionary Court  
  Decision Date:November 12, 2015

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Feb 10 2016 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 11, 2016)
Mar 2 2016 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including April 11, 2016.
Apr 11 2016 Brief of respondent Paul Scott Schwarz, Personal Representative of the Estate of Michelle Schwarz in opposition filed.
Apr 25 2016 Reply of petitioner Philip Morris USA Inc., filed.
Apr 26 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 12, 2016.
May 16 2016 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Theodore J. Boutrous Jr. Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP(213) 229-7000
    Counsel of Record333 South Grand Avenue
Los Angeles, CA  90071
tboutrous@gibsondunn.com
Party name: Philip Morris USA Inc.,
Attorneys for Respondent:
Robert S. Peck Center for Constitutional Litigation, P.C.(202) 944-2803
    Counsel of Record777 6th Street, NW, Suite 250
Washington, DC  20001
robert.peck@cclfirm.com
Party name: Paul Scott Schwarz, Personal Representative of the Estate of Michelle Schwarz

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543