Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 14D2790
No. 14D2790
Title:AMU, LANRE
Atty Name:Lanre O. Amu
City/State:Chicago, Illinois
  Sex:M
  Barno:280457
Mailing Info:
  Filing Party:
Lower Ct: Supreme Court of Illinois
  Action: Suspended

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Jun 30 2014 Suspense Filed
Aug 11 2014 Suspense Order
Sep 25 2014 Return Filed
Sep 25 2014 Response Filed
Oct 17 2014 Response Conference
Oct 20 2014 Final Order - Disbarred
May 28, 2017 | Version 2014.2