Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 14A650
No. 14A650
Title:
John H. Armstrong, Secretary, Florida Department of Health, et al., Applicants
v.
James D. Brenner, et al.
Docketed:December 16, 2014
Lower Ct:United States District Court for the Northern District of Florida
  Case Nos.:(4:14-cv-107, 4:14-cv-138)

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Dec 15 2014 Application (14A650) for a stay pending appeal, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Dec 16 2014 Response to application (14A650) requested by Justice Thomas, due Thursday, December 18, 2014, by 5 p.m.
Dec 18 2014 Response to application from respondent Sloan Grimsley, et al. filed.
Dec 18 2014 Response to application from respondent James D. Brenner, et al. filed.
Dec 19 2014 Application (14A650) referred to the Court.
Dec 19 2014 Application (14A650) denied by the Court. Justice Scalia and Justice Thomas would grant the application for stay.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioners:
Allen C. Winsor Solicitor General(850) 414-3600
Office of the Attorney General
The Capitol, PL-01
Tallahassee, FL  32399-1050
Party name: John H. Armstrong, Secretary, Florida Department of Health, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents:
Leslie Cooper 125 Broad Street 18th Floor(212) 549-2627
New York, NY  10004
Party name: Sloan Grimsley, et al.
 
Wm. J. Sheppard Sheppard, White & Kachergus, P.A.(904) 356-9661
215 Washington Street
Jackson, FL  32202
Party name: James D. Brenner, et al.
June 24, 2017 | Version 2014.2