Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results

        

Docket for 14A596
No. 14A596
Title:
Federal Energy Regulatory Commission, Applicant
v.
Electric Power Supply Association, et al.
Docketed:December 5, 2014
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
  Case Nos.:(11-1486, 12-1088, 12-1091, 12-1093)

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Dec 5 2014 Application (14A596) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 16, 2014 to January 15, 2015, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Dec 8 2014 Application (14A596) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until January 15, 2015.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
    Counsel of Record United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
Party name: Federal Energy Regulatory Commission
February 26, 2017 | Version 2014.2