Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 14A1004
No. 14A1004
Title:
George Wesley Huguely, V, Applicant
v.
Virginia
Docketed:March 26, 2015
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Virginia
  Case Nos.:(140678)

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Mar 26 2015 Application (14A1004) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 15, 2015 to May 15, 2015, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Mar 27 2015 Application (14A1004) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until May 15, 2015.
May 1 2015 Application (14A1004) to extend further the time from May 15, 2015 to June 12, 2015, submitted to The Chief Justice.
May 4 2015 Application (14A1004) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until June 12, 2015.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Paul D. Clement Bancroft PLLC(202) 234-0090
1919 M Street, N.W., Suite 470
Washington, DC  20036
Party name: George Wesley Huguely, V

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543