Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 14-9489
No. 14-9489     *** CAPITAL CASE ***  
Title:
Tyrone Chalmers, Petitioner
v.
Tennessee
Docketed:April 27, 2015
Linked with 14A812
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Tennessee, Western Division
  Case Nos.:(W2013-02317-CCA-R3-PD)
  Decision Date:June 30, 2014
Discretionary Court  
  Decision Date:November 19, 2014

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Jan 26 2015 Application (14A812) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 17, 2015 to April 18, 2015, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Jan 28 2015 Application (14A812) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until April 18, 2015.
Apr 17 2015 Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 27, 2015)
Jun 4 2015 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including June 26, 2015.
Jul 17 2015 Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including July 27, 2015.
Aug 24 2015 Brief of respondent Tennessee in opposition filed.
Sep 3 2015 Reply of petitioner Tyrone Chalmers filed.
Sep 10 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 28, 2015.
Oct 5 2015 Petition DENIED.
Oct 29 2015 Petition for Rehearing filed.
Nov 4 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 24, 2015.
Nov 30 2015 Rehearing DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Gretchen Leigh Swift 810 Broadway(615) 736-5047
    Counsel of RecordSuite 200
Nashville, TN  37203
Party name: Tyrone Chalmers
Attorneys for Respondent:
James E. Gaylord Assistant Attorney General(615) 532-7356
Office of the Tennessee Attorney General
P.O. Box 20207
Nashville, TN  37202-0207
jim.gaylord@ag.tn.gov
Party name: Tennessee

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543