Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results

        

Docket for 14-9396
No. 14-9396
Title:
Cody Robert Judy, Petitioner
v.
Barack H. Obama, President of the United States, et al.
Docketed:April 20, 2015
Linked with 15A25
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(14-4136)
  Decision Date:February 3, 2015
  Rehearing Denied:February 27, 2015

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Mar 30 2015 Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 20, 2015)
Apr 27 2015 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from petitioner.
May 20 2015 Waiver of right of respondent Barack H. Obama, President of the United States to respond filed.
Jun 3 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 18, 2015.
Jun 22 2015 The motion of petitioner for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is denied. Petitioner is allowed until July 13, 2015, within which to pay the docketing fee required by Rule 38(a) and to submit a petition in compliance with Rule 33.1 of the Rules of this Court.
Jun 24 2015 Motion for reconsideration of order denying leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by petitioner.
Jun 29 2015 Application (15A25) for an extension of time within which to comply with the order of June 22, 2015, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Jul 1 2015 Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 28, 2015.
Jul 7 2015 Application (15A25) denied by Justice Sotomayor.
Oct 5 2015 Motion for reconsideration of order denying leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by petitioner DENIED.
Oct 8 2015 Case considered closed.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Cody Robert Judy 3031 South Ogden Avenue
Suite #2
Ogden, UT  84403
Party name: Cody Robert Judy
Attorneys for Respondents:
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
    Counsel of Record United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: Barack H. Obama, President of the United States
December 05, 2016 | Version 2014.2