Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 14-920
No. 14-920
Title:
City of Lomita, California, Petitioner
v.
Robin Fortyune
Docketed:January 30, 2015
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(12-56280)
  Decision Date:September 5, 2014
  Rehearing Denied:October 30, 2014

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Jan 26 2015 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 2, 2015)
Mar 2 2015 Brief amici curiae of League of California Cities, et al. filed.
Mar 18 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 3, 2015.
Mar 30 2015 Response Requested . (Due April 29, 2015)
Apr 20 2015 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including May 26, 2015.
May 26 2015 Brief of respondent Robin Fortyune in opposition filed.
Jun 4 2015 Reply of petitioner City of Lomita, California filed.
Jun 9 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 25, 2015.
Jun 29 2015 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Lee Harris Roistacher 462 Stevens Avenue, Suite 201 858-755-5666 x7132
    Counsel of RecordSolana Beach, CA  92075
lroistacher@daleyheft.com
Party name: City of Lomita, California
Attorneys for Respondent:
Russell C. Handy Center for Disability Access(858) 375-7385
    Counsel of Record9845 Erma Road, Suite 300
San Diego, CA  92131
russ@potterhandy.com
Party name: Robin Fortyune
 
Mark D. Potter Potter Handy LLP(760) 480-4162
    Counsel of Record9845 Erma Road, Suite 400
San Diego, CA  92131
mark@potterhandy.com
Party name: Robin Fortyune
Other:
Alison Daly Alpert Best Best & Krieger LLP(619) 525-1300
655 West Broadway 15th Floor
San Diego, CA  92101
alison.alpert@ bbklaw.com
Party name: League of California Cities, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543