Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 14-864
No. 14-864
Title:
Hillcrest Property, LLP, Petitioner
v.
Pasco County, Florida
Docketed:January 20, 2015
Linked with 14A497
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
  Case Nos.:(13-12383)
  Decision Date:June 18, 2014
  Rehearing Denied:September 2, 2014

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Nov 5 2014 Application (14A497) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 1, 2014 to January 15, 2015, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Nov 11 2014 Application (14A497) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until January 15, 2015.
Jan 15 2015 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 19, 2015)
Feb 11 2015 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including March 11, 2015.
Feb 19 2015 Brief amici curiae of National Association of Home Builders, et al. filed.
Mar 11 2015 Brief of respondent Pasco County, Florida in opposition filed.
Mar 25 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 17, 2015.
Apr 1 2015 Reply of petitioner Hillcrest Property, LLP filed. (Distributed)
Apr 20 2015 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
David Smolker Bricklemyer Smolker & Bolves, P.A.(813) 223-3888
500 East Kennedy Blvd., Suite 200
Tampa, FL  33602
davids@bsbfirm.com
Party name: Hillcrest Property, LLP
Attorneys for Respondent:
Donald Edward Hemke Carlton Fields Jorden Burt, PA(813) 223-7000
    Counsel of Record4221 West Boy Scout Boulevard, Suite 1000
Tampa, FL  33607-5780
dhemke@cfjblaw@pascocountyfl.net
Party name: Pasco County, Florida
Other:
Devala Anant Janardan National Association of Home Builders(202)-266-8335
1201 15th Street NW
Washington, DC  20005
djanardan@nahb
Party name: National Association of Home Builders, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543