Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 14-842
No. 14-842
Title:
Jonathan Corbett, Petitioner
v.
Transportation Security Administration, et al.
Docketed:January 16, 2015
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
  Case Nos.:(13-14053)
  Decision Date:June 4, 2014
  Rehearing Denied:August 19, 2014

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Nov 17 2014 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 17, 2015)
Feb 18 2015 Waiver of right of respondents Transportation Security Administration, et al. to respond filed.
Mar 4 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 20, 2015.
Mar 23 2015 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Jonathan Corbett 382 N.E. 191st Street # 86952(305) 600-0410
Miami, FL  33179
jon@professional-troublemaker.com
Party name: Jonathan Corbett
Attorneys for Respondents:
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
    Counsel of Record United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: Transportation Security Administration, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543