Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 14-8082
No. 14-8082
Title:
Waseem Daker, Petitioner
v.
John Mark Dawes, et al.
Docketed:January 22, 2015
Linked with 14A610
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
  Case Nos.:(14-13046)
  Decision Date:August 18, 2014

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Oct 28 2014 Application (14A610) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 16, 2014 to January 15, 2015, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Dec 9 2014 Application (14A610) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until January 15, 2015.
Dec 31 2014 Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 23, 2015)
Mar 12 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 27, 2015.
Mar 30 2015 The motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is denied, and the petition for a writ of certiorari is dismissed. See Rule 39.8.
Apr 24 2015 Motion for reconsideration of order denying leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by petitioner.
Jun 2 2015 Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 18, 2015.
Jun 22 2015 Motion for reconsideration of order denying leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by petitioner DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Waseem Daker # 901373
Georgia State Prison
300 1st Avenue South
Reidsville, GA  30453
Party name: Waseem Daker

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543