Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 14-7899
No. 14-7899
Title:
Moshe Perry, Petitioner
v.
EDD, et al.
Docketed:January 9, 2015
Linked with 14A75
Lower Ct:Court of Appeal of California, Second Appellate District
  Case Nos.:(B250107)
  Decision Date:October 1, 2013
  Rehearing Denied:October 23, 2013
Discretionary Court  
  Decision Date:January 15, 2014

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Apr 8 2014 Application (14A75) to file petition for a writ of certiorari in excess of page limits, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Apr 8 2014 Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 9, 2015)
Jul 23 2014 Application (14A75) denied by Justice Kennedy.
Jan 29 2015 Waiver of right of respondent California Unemployment Insurance Appeals Board to respond filed.
Feb 26 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 20, 2015.
Mar 23 2015 The motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is denied, and the petition for a writ of certiorari is dismissed. See Rule 39.8.
Apr 14 2015 Motion for reconsideration of order denying leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by petitioner.
Jun 2 2015 Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 18, 2015.
Jun 22 2015 Motion for reconsideration of order denying leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by petitioner DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Moshe Perry 23705 Vanowen St. #262(747) 224-9515
West Hills, CA  91307
Party name: Moshe Perry
Attorneys for Respondents:
Phillip Matsumoto Office of the Attorney General(213) 897-2454
    Counsel of Record300 South Spring Street, Suite 1702
Los Angeles, CA  90013
Party name: California Unemployment Insurance Appeals Board

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543