Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results

        

Docket for 14-751
No. 14-751
Title:
Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America, et al., Petitioners
v.
County of Alameda, California, et al.
Docketed:December 29, 2014
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(13-16833)
  Decision Date:September 30, 2014

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Dec 24 2014 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 23, 2015)
Jan 28 2015 Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Washington Legal Foundation, et al. .
Jan 28 2015 Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America.
Feb 11 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 27, 2015.
Feb 12 2015 Response Requested . (Due March 16, 2015)
Feb 25 2015 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including April 15, 2015.
Apr 15 2015 Brief of respondents County of Alameda, California, et al. in opposition filed.
Apr 29 2015 Reply of petitioners Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America, et al filed.
May 5 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 21, 2015.
May 26 2015 Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Washington Legal Foundation, et al. GRANTED.
May 26 2015 Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America GRANTED.
May 26 2015 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioners:
Michael A. Carvin Jones Day(202) 879-3939
51 Louisiana Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20001
macarvin@jonesday.com
Party name: Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America, et al
Attorneys for Respondents:
Arthur J. Shartsis Shartsis Friese LLP(415) 421-6500
    Counsel of RecordOne Maritime Plaza, 18th Floor
San Francisco, CA  94111-3598
ashartsis@sflaw.com
Party name: County of Alameda, California, et al.
 
Mary Jo C. Shartsis One Maritime Plaza 18th Floor(415) 421-6500
San Francisco, CA  94111-3598
Party name: County of Alameda, California, et al.
Other:
Fred A. Rowley Jr. Munger Tolles & Olson LLP(213) 683-9100
355 South Grand Avenue
35th Floor
Los Angeles, CA  90071
Fred.Rowley@mto.com
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
 
Richard A. Samp Washington Legal Foundation(202) 588-0302
2009 Massachusetts Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20036
rsamp@wlf.org
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation, et al.
August 28, 2016 | Version 2014.2