Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results

        

Docket for 14-741
No. 14-741
Title:
Self-Insurance Institute of America, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Rick Snyder, Governor of Michigan, et al.
Docketed:December 23, 2014
Linked with 14A373
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(12-2264)
  Decision Date:August 4, 2014

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Oct 3 2014 Application (14A373) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 2, 2014 to December 18, 2014, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Oct 7 2014 Application (14A373) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until December 18, 2014.
Dec 18 2014 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 22, 2015)
Jan 20 2015 Brief amicus curiae of The National Coordinating Committee for Multiemployer filed.
Jan 22 2015 Brief amicus curiae of The Chamber of Comerce of the United States of America filed.
Jan 22 2015 Waiver of right of respondents Rick Snyder, Governor of Michigan, et al. to respond filed.
Feb 4 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 20, 2015.
Feb 6 2015 Response Requested . (Due March 9, 2015)
Feb 26 2015 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including April 23, 2015.
Apr 23 2015 Brief of respondents Rick Snyder, Governor of Michigan, et al. in opposition filed.
May 11 2015 Reply of petitioner Self-Insurance Institute of America, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
May 12 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 28, 2015.
May 22 2015 Rescheduled.
Jun 2 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 18, 2015.
Jun 22 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 25, 2015.
Mar 1 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 4, 2016.
Mar 7 2016 Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Gobeille v. Liberty Mut. Ins. Co., 577 U. S. ___ (2016).
Apr 8 2016 JUDGMENT ISSUED



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Bert W. Rein Wiley Rein LLP(202) 719-7080
    Counsel of Record1776 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20006
brein@wileyrein.com
Party name: Self-Insurance Institute of America, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents:
Aaron D. Lindstrom Solicitor General(517) 373-1124
    Counsel of Record Michigan Department of Attorney General
P.O. Box 30212
Lansing, MI  48909
LindstromA@michigan.gov
Party name: Rick Snyder, Governor of Michigan, et al.
Other:
Carol Connor Cohen Arent Fox LLP(202)-857-6054
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC  20036
cohen.carol@arentfox.com
Party name: The Chamber of Comerce of the United States of America
 
Sally M. Tedrow O'Donoghue & O'Donoghue, LLP(202) 362-0041
4748 Wisconsin Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC  20016-0000
jmcintire@odonoghuelaw.com
Party name: The National Coordinating Committee for Multiemployer
February 23, 2017 | Version 2014.2