Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 14-689
No. 14-689
Title:
Lanre O. Amu, Petitioner
v.
Illinois Attorney Registration and Disciplinary Commission
Docketed:December 10, 2014
Linked with 14A414
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Illinois
  Case Nos.:(M.R. 26545)
  Decision Date:May 16, 2014
  Rehearing Denied:July 10, 2014

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Sep 26 2014 Application (14A414) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 8, 2014 to December 7, 2014, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Oct 17 2014 Application (14A414) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until December 7, 2014.
Dec 8 2014 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 9, 2015)
Dec 19 2014 Waiver of right of respondent Illinois Attorney Registration and Disciplinary Commission to respond filed.
Jan 7 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 23, 2015.
Jan 26 2015 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Lanre O. Amu 4550 N. Clarendon Avenue(773) 728-8249
Unit 1404 South
Chicago, IL  60605
loamu@aol.com
Party name: Lanre O. Amu
Attorneys for Respondent:
Steve Splitt Illinois Attorney Registration & Disciplinary Commission(312) 540-5329
    Counsel of Record130 East Randolph Drive, Suite 1500
Chicago, IL  60601
Party name: Illinois Attorney Registration and Disciplinary Commission
March 24, 2017 | Version 2014.2