Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 14-6797
No. 14-6797
Title:
Frederick Stampone, Petitioner
v.
Amanda B. Fopma, et al.
Docketed:October 21, 2014
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
  Case Nos.:(13-4436)
  Decision Date:May 19, 2014

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Aug 11 2014 Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 20, 2014)
Oct 24 2014 Waiver of right of respondents Amanda B. Fopma, et al. to respond filed.
Nov 19 2014 Waiver of right of respondent G. Patrick Hillary to respond filed.
Nov 21 2014 Waiver of right of respondents Michigan, et al. to respond filed.
Nov 26 2014 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of December 12, 2014.
Dec 15 2014 The motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is denied, and the petition for a writ of certiorari is dismissed. See Rule 39.8.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Frederick Stampone P.O. Box 736(201) 491-1549
Ridgefield Park, NJ  07660
Party name: Frederick Stampone
Attorneys for Respondents:
Drew W. Broaddus Secrest Wardle(616) 272-7966
    Counsel of Record2025 East Beltine, Suite 600
Grand Rapids, MI  49546-5805
dbroaddus@secrestwardle.com
Party name: Amanda B. Fopma, et al.
 
Leo J. Hurley Jr. Connell Foley, LLP(201) 521-1000
    Counsel of Record2510 Plaza Five, Harborside Financial Center
Jersey City, NJ  07311
lhurley@connellfoley.com
Party name: G. Patrick Hillary
 
Aaron D. Lindstrom Solicitor General(517) 373-1124
    Counsel of Record Michigan Department of Attorney General
P.O. Box 30212
Lansing, MI  48909
lindstroma@michigan.gov
Party name: Michigan, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543