Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results

        

Docket for 14-646
No. 14-646
Title:
Sai, Petitioner
v.
United States Postal Service
Docketed:December 2, 2014
Linked with 14A70
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
  Case Nos.:(14-1005)
  Decision Date:May 13, 2014
  Rehearing Denied:June 23, 2014

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Jul 14 2014 Application (14A70) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 21, 2014 to November 20, 2014, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Jul 18 2014 Application (14A70) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until November 20, 2014.
Nov 20 2014 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 5, 2015)
Jan 5 2015 Waiver of right of respondent United States Postal Service to respond filed.
Jan 5 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Maryland Volunteer Lawyers Service filed.
Jan 5 2015 Brief amici curiae of Western Center on Law and Poverty and Legal Aid Association of California filed.
Jan 14 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 20, 2015.
Jan 26 2015 Response Requested . (Due February 25, 2015)
Feb 19 2015 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including March 27, 2015.
Mar 27 2015 Brief of respondent United States Postal Service in opposition filed.
Apr 2 2015 Reply of petitioner Sai filed.
Apr 8 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 24, 2015.
Apr 27 2015 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Tillman J. Breckenridge Reed Smith LLP(202) 414-9200
    Counsel of Record1301 K Street, NW
Washington, DC  20005
tbreckenridge@reedsmith.com
Party name: Sai
Attorneys for Respondent:
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
    Counsel of Record United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: United States Postal Service
Other:
Michael J. Bentley Bradley Arant Boult Cummings, LLP(601) 592-9935
188 E. Capitol Street, Suite 400
Jackson, MS  39201
mbentley@babc.com
Party name: Western Center on Law and Poverty and Legal Aid Association of California
 
Steven M. Klepper Kramon & Graham, P. A.(410) 752-6030
One South Street
Suite 2600
Baltimore, MD  21202-3201
sklepper@kg-law.com
Party name: Maryland Volunteer Lawyers Service
February 26, 2017 | Version 2014.2