Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 14-6087
No. 14-6087
Title:
H. William Van Allen, Petitioner
v.
Robert A. McDonald, Secretary of Veterans Affairs
Docketed:September 3, 2014
Linked with 13A1183
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
  Case Nos.:(14-7058)
  Decision Date:May 13, 2014

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
May 27 2014 Application (13A1183) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 11, 2014 to September 14, 2014, submitted to The Chief Justice.
May 29 2014 Application (13A1183) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until September 14, 2014.
Aug 18 2014 Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 3, 2014)
Oct 3 2014 Waiver of right of respondent Robert A. McDonald, Secretary of Veterans Affairs to respond filed.
Oct 9 2014 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 31, 2014.
Nov 3 2014 The motion of petitioner for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is denied. Petitioner is allowed until November 24, 2014, within which to pay the docketing fee required by Rule 38(a) and to submit a petition in compliance with Rule 33.1 of the Rules of this Court.
Nov 24 2014 Motion for reconsideration of order denying leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by petitioner.
Dec 3 2014 Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 9, 2015.
Jan 12 2015 Motion for reconsideration of order denying leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by petitioner DENIED.
Jan 15 2015 Case considered closed.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
H. William Van Allen 351 North Road
Hurley, NY  12247
Party name: H. William Van Allen
Attorneys for Respondent:
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: Robert A. McDonald, Secretary of Veterans Affairs

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543