Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 14-586
No. 14-586
Title:
Oklahoma, ex rel. E. Scott Pruitt, Attorney General of Oklahoma, Petitioner
v.
Sylvia Burwell, Secretary of Health and Human Services, et al.
Docketed:November 20, 2014
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(14-7080)
Rule 11

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Nov 18 2014 Petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment filed. (Response due December 22, 2014)
Dec 2 2014 Brief amici curiae of West Virginia and 11 other States filed.
Dec 22 2014 Brief of respondents Sylvia Burwell, Secretary of Health and Human Services, et al. in opposition filed.
Jan 7 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 23, 2015.
Jan 26 2015 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
E. Scott Pruitt Attorney General(405) 521-3921
Office of the Attorney General
313 NE 21st Street
Oklahoma City, OK  73105
Scott.Pruitt@oag.ok.gov
Party name: Oklahoma, ex rel. E. Scott Pruitt, Attorney General of Oklahoma
Attorneys for Respondents:
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
    Counsel of Record United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: Sylvia Burwell, Secretary of Health and Human Services, et al.
Other:
Elbert Lin Solicitor General(304) 558-2021
Office of Attorney General
State Capitol
Building 1, Room E-26
Charleston, WV  25305
Elbert.Lin@wvago.gov
Party name: West Virginia and 11 other States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543