Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 14-5227
No. 14-5227
Title:
Daniel Arroyo, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:July 15, 2014
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
  Case Nos.:(13-13809)
  Decision Date:April 9, 2014

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Jul 8 2014 Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 14, 2014)
Aug 7 2014 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including September 15, 2014.
Sep 12 2014 Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Sep 25 2014 Reply of petitioner Daniel Arroyo filed.
Oct 2 2014 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 17, 2014.
Oct 27 2014 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 31, 2014.
Jun 25 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 29, 2015.
Jun 30 2015 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Johnson v. United States, 576 U. S. ___ (2015). Justice Alito concurring in the decision to grant, vacate, and remand in this case. Following the recommendation of the Solicitor General, the Court has held the petition in this and many other cases pending the decision in Johnson v. United States, 576 U. S. ____ (2015). In holding these petitions and now in vacating and remanding the decisions below in these cases, the Court has not differentiated between cases in which the petitioners would be entitled to relief if the Court held (as it now has) that the residual clause of the Armed Career Criminal Act of 1984, 18 U. S. C. Sec. 924(e)(2)(B)(ii), is void for vagueness and cases in which relief would not be warranted for a procedural reason. On remand, the Court of Appeals should understand that the Court's disposition of this petition does not reflect any view regarding petitioner's entitlement to relief.
Aug 3 2015 JUDGMENT ISSUED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
M. Allison Guagliardo Assistant Federal Public Defender(813) 228-2715
    Counsel of Record400 North Tampa Street, Suite 2700
Tampa, FL  33602
allison_guagliardo@fd.org
Party name: Daniel Arroyo
Attorneys for Respondent:
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
    Counsel of Record United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543