Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 14-518
No. 14-518
Title:
Eric Cantor, et al., Appellants
v.
Gloria Personhuballah, et al.
Docketed:November 4, 2014
Lower Ct:United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
  Case Nos.:(3:13cv678)
  Decision Date:October 7, 2014

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Oct 31 2014 Statement as to jurisdiction filed. (Response due December 4, 2014)
Dec 4 2014 Motion to dismiss or affirm filed by appellees Gloria Personhuballah and James Farkas.
Dec 22 2014 Reply of appellant Eric Cantor, et al., Appellants filed. (Distributed)
Dec 23 2014 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 9, 2015.
Mar 25 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 27, 2015.
Mar 30 2015 Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Alabama Legislative Black Caucus v. Alabama, 575 U. S. ____ (2015).
May 1 2015 JUDGMENT ISSUED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Appellants:
Michael A. Carvin Jones Day(202) 879-3939
    Counsel of Record51 Louisiana Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20001
macarvin@jonesday.com
Party name: Eric Cantor, et al., Appellants
Attorneys for Appellees:
Marc E. Elias Perkins Coie, LLP(202) 654-6200
    Counsel of Record700 Thirteenth Street, NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC  20005-3960
melias@perkinscoie.com
Party name: Gloria Personhuballah,and James Farkas
March 26, 2017 | Version 2014.2