Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 14-460
No. 14-460
Title:
John Hickenlooper, Governor of Colorado, Petitioner
v.
Andy Kerr, et al.
Docketed:October 22, 2014
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(12-1445)
  Decision Date:March 7, 2014
  Rehearing Denied:July 22, 2014

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Oct 17 2014 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 21, 2014)
Nov 20 2014 Brief amici curiae of The Colorado Union of Taxpayers Foundation, et al. filed.
Nov 20 2014 Brief amici curiae of Cato Institute, et al. filed.
Nov 21 2014 Brief of respondents Andy Kerr, et al. in opposition filed.
Nov 21 2014 Brief amici curiae of Texas, et al. filed.
Nov 21 2014 Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
Nov 21 2014 Brief amici curiae of National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center, et al. filed.
Dec 2 2014 Reply of petitioner John Hickenlooper, Governor of Colorado filed.
Dec 3 2014 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 9, 2015.
Jun 25 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 29, 2015.
Jun 30 2015 Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Arizona State Legislature v. Arizona Independent Redistricting Comm´┐Żn, 576 U. S. ___ (2015).
Aug 3 2015 JUDGMENT ISSUED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Daniel D. Domenico Solicitor General(720) 508-6559
Colorado Department of Law
Ralph L. Carr Colorado Judicial Center
1300 Broadway, 10th Floor
Denver, CO  80203
dan.domenico@state.co.us
Party name: John Hickenlooper, Governor of Colorado
Attorneys for Respondents:
David Evans Skaggs McKenna Long & Aldridge, LLP(303) 634-4000
    Counsel of Record1400 Wewatta St. #700
Denver, CO  80202
dskaggs@mckennalong.com
Party name: Andy Kerr, et al.
Other:
Adam W. Aston Assistant Solicitor General(512) 936-0596
Office of Attorney General
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX  78711-2458
adam.aston@texasattorneygeneral.gov
Party name: Texas, et al.
 
Steven J. Lechner Mountain States Legal Foundation(303) 292-2021
2596 South Lewis Way
Lakewood, CO  80227
lechner@mountainstateslegal.com
Party name: The Colorado Union of Taxpayers Foundation, et al.
 
Milton Allen Miller Latham & Watkins LLP(213) 891-8222
355 South Grand Avenue
Los Angeles, CA  90071-0000
milt.miller@lw.com
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
 
Ilya Shapiro Cato Institute(202) 842-0200
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC  20001
ishapiro@cato.org
Party name: Cato Institute, et al.
 
Luke Anthony Wake NFIB Small Business Legal Center(202) 554-9000
1201 F St. N.W., Suite 200
Washington, DC  20004
luke.wake@nfib.org
Party name: National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center, et al.
June 25, 2017 | Version 2014.2