Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results

Docket for 14-448
No. 14-448
Google, Inc., Petitioner
Vederi, LLC
Docketed:October 20, 2014
Linked with 14A217
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
  Case Nos.:(2013-1057, 2013-1296)
  Decision Date:March 14, 2014
  Rehearing Denied:June 18, 2014

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Aug 25 2014 Application (14A217) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 16, 2014 to October 16, 2014, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Aug 25 2014 Application (14A217) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until October 16, 2014.
Oct 16 2014 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 19, 2014)
Nov 19 2014 Brief of respondent Vederi, LLC in opposition filed.
Nov 19 2014 Brief amici curiae of Acushnet Company, et al. filed.
Dec 3 2014 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 9, 2015.
Dec 3 2014 Reply of petitioner Google, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Jan 12 2015 The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
May 19 2015 Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Jun 2 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 18, 2015.
Jun 2 2015 Supplemental brief of petitioner Google, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Jun 22 2015 Petition DENIED.

~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Daryl L. Joseffer King & Spalding LLP(202) 737-0500
    Counsel of Record1700 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20006
Party name: Google, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent:
David A. Dillard Christie Parker & Hale LLP(626) 795-9900
    Counsel of Record655 North Central Avenue, Suite 2300
GlendalePasadena, CA  91203
Party name: Vederi, LLC
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
Party name: United States
Philip J. Warrick Klarquist Sparkman LLP503-595-5300
One World Trade Center
121 SW Salmon Street, Suite 1600
Portland, OR  97204
Party name: Acushnet Company, et al.


SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543