Docket for 14-424
No. 14-424 | |
Title: |
Sigram Schindler Beteiligungsgesellschaft MBH, Petitioner |
v. |
Michelle K. Lee, Acting Director, Patent and Trademark Office |
|
Docketed: | October 14, 2014 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (2012-1297) |
Decision Date: | April 4, 2014 |
Rehearing Denied: | July 14, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Oct 6 2014 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 13, 2014) |
Oct 28 2014 |
Waiver of right of respondent Michelle K. Lee, Acting Director, Patent and Trademark Office to respond filed. |
Nov 3 2014 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 25, 2014. |
Nov 21 2014 |
Rescheduled. |
Dec 1 2014 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of December 5, 2014. |
Dec 8 2014 |
Petition DENIED. |
|