Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results

        

Docket for 14-410
No. 14-410
Title:
Google, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Oracle America, Inc.
Docketed:October 8, 2014
Linked with 14A34
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
  Case Nos.:(2013-1021, 2013-1022)
  Decision Date:May 9, 2014

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Jul 9 2014 Application (14A34) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 7, 2014 to October 6, 2014, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Jul 10 2014 Application (14A34) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until October 6, 2014.
Oct 6 2014 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 7, 2014)
Oct 21 2014 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 8, 2014.
Oct 22 2014 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the petitioner.
Nov 7 2014 Brief amicus curiae of Computer & Communications Industry Association filed.
Nov 7 2014 Brief amici curiae of Hewlett-Packard Company, Red Hat, Inc., and Yahoo, Inc. filed.
Nov 7 2014 Brief amicus curiae of Public Knowledge filed.
Nov 7 2014 Brief amici curiae of Computer Scientists filed.
Nov 7 2014 Brief amici curiae of The Open Source Initiative, Mozilla Corp., and Engine filed.
Nov 7 2014 Brief amicus curiae of Intellectual Property Professors filed.
Dec 8 2014 Brief of respondent Oracle America, Inc. in opposition filed.
Dec 8 2014 Brief amicus curiae of Software Freedon Law Center, and Free Software Foundation filed.
Dec 23 2014 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 9, 2015.
Dec 23 2014 Reply of petitioner Google, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Jan 12 2015 The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States. Justice Alito took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.
May 26 2015 Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Jun 9 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 25, 2015.
Jun 9 2015 Supplemental brief of petitioner Google, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Jun 29 2015 Petition DENIED. Justice Alito took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Daryl L. Joseffer King & Spalding LLP(202) 737-0500
    Counsel of Record1700 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20006
djoseffer@kslaw.com
Party name: Google, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent:
E. Joshua Rosenkranz Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP(212) 506-5000
    Counsel of Record51 West 52nd Street
New York, NY  10019-6142
jrosenkranz@orrick.com
Party name: Oracle America, Inc.
Other:
Jonathan Band Jonathan Band PLLC(202) 296-5675
21 Dupont Circle NW, Suite 800
Washington, DC  20036
jband@policybandwidth.com
Party name: Computer & Communications Industry Association
 
Andrew P. Bridges Fenwick & West LLP(415) 591-1482
555 California Street, 12th Floor
San Francisco, CA  94104
abridges@fenwick.com
Party name: Hewlett-Packard Company, Red Hat, Inc., and Yahoo, Inc.
 
Charles Duan Public Knowledge(202) 861-0020
1818 N Street, NW, Suite 410
Washington, DC  20036
cduan@publicknowledge.org
Party name: Public Knowledge
 
Corynne McSherry Electronic Frontier Foundation(415)-436-9333
815 Eddy Street
San Francisco, CA  94109
corynne@eff.org
Party name: Computer Scientists
 
Eben Moglen Software Freedom Law Center(212) 461-1900
1995 Broadway, 17th Floor
New York, NY  10023
moglen@softwarefreedom.org
Party name: Software Freedon Law Center, and Free Software Foundation
 
Pamela Samuelson University of California (510) 642-6775
Berkeley School of Law
434 Boalt Hall
Berkeley, CA  94720
pam@law.berkeley.edu
Party name: Intellectual Property Professors
 
Jason M. Schultz NYU School of Law(212) 992-7365
245 Sullivan Street, 609
New York, NC  10012
jason.schultz@exchange.law.nyu.edu
Party name: The Open Source Initiative, Mozilla Corp., and Engine
 
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: United States
August 29, 2016 | Version 2014.2