Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 14-307
No. 14-307
Title:
Grain Processing Corporation, Petitioner
v.
Laurie Freeman, et al.
Docketed:September 15, 2014
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Iowa
  Case Nos.:(13-0723)
  Decision Date:June 13, 2014

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Sep 11 2014 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 15, 2014)
Oct 8 2014 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including October 22, 2014.
Oct 14 2014 Brief amici curiae of National Association of Manufacturers, et al. filed.
Oct 22 2014 Brief of respondents Laurie Freeman, et al. in opposition filed.
Oct 31 2014 Reply of petitioner Grain Processing Corporation filed.
Nov 10 2014 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 25, 2014.
Dec 1 2014 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Mark McCormick Belin McCormick (515) 283-4615
666 Walnut Street, Ste. 2000
Des Moines, IA  50309-3989
mmccormick@belinmccormick.com
Party name: Grain Processing Corporation
Attorneys for Respondents:
Sarah E. Siskind Miner Barnhill & Galland PC(608) 255-5200
    Counsel of Record44 E. Mifflin Street
Suite 803
Madison, WI  53703
ssiskind@lawmbg.com
Party name: Laurie Freeman, et al.
Other:
Richard O. Faulk Hollingsworth LLP(202) 898-5800
1350 I Street, NW
Washington, DC  20005
rfaulk@hollingsworthllp.com
Party name: National Association of Manufacturers, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543