Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 14-297
No. 14-297
Title:
SQM North America Corporation, Petitioner
v.
City of Pomona, California
Docketed:September 11, 2014
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(12-55147)
  Decision Date:May 2, 2014
  Rehearing Denied:June 10, 2014

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Sep 8 2014 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 14, 2014)
Sep 19 2014 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or neither party, received from counsel for petitioner and the respondent.
Sep 30 2014 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 13, 2014.
Oct 14 2014 Brief amicus curiae of Coalition for Litigation Justice, Inc filed.
Oct 14 2014 Brief amici curiae of American Coatings Association, et al. filed.
Oct 14 2014 Brief amicus curiae of DRI - The Voice of the Defense Bar filed.
Oct 14 2014 Brief amici curiae of Atlantic Legal Foundation, et al. filed.
Nov 13 2014 Brief of respondent City of Pomona, California in opposition filed.
Nov 19 2014 Letter of November 19, 2014, from counsel for petitioner waiving 14-day waiting period pursuant to Rule 15.5.
Nov 24 2014 Reply of petitioner SQM North America Corporation filed.
Nov 25 2014 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of December 12, 2014.
Dec 15 2014 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Neal Kumar Katyal Hogan Lovells US LLP(202) 637-5600
    Counsel of Record555 Thirteenth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20004
neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com
Party name: SQM North America Corporation
Attorneys for Respondent:
Paul M. Smith Jenner & Block LLP(202) 639-6060
    Counsel of Record1099 New York Avenue, N.W., Suite 900
Washington, DC  20001
psmith@jenner.com
Party name: City of Pomona, California
Other:
Clifton S. Elgarten Crowell & Moring LLC(202) 624-2500
1001 Pennsylvania Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC  20004
celgarten@crowell.com
Party name: Coalition for Litigation Justice, Inc
 
Martin S. Kaufman Atlantic Legal Foundation(914) 834-3322
2039 Palmer Avenue
Larchmont, NY  10538
mskaufman@atlanticlegal.org
Party name: Atlantic Legal Foundation, et al.
 
Eric G. Lasker Hollingsworth LLP(202) 898-5800
1350 I Street, NW
Washington, DC  20005
elasker@hollingsworthllp.com
Party name: American Coatings Association, et al.
 
J. Michael Weston President(312) 795-1101
DRI - The Voice of the Defense Bar
55 West Monroe
Chicago, IL  60603
mweston@wclawyers.com
Party name: DRI - The Voice of the Defense Bar

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543