Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 14-211
No. 14-211
Title:
Republic of Argentina, Petitioner
v.
BG Group plc
Docketed:August 21, 2014
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
  Case Nos.:(11-7021)
  Decision Date:April 15, 2014
  Rehearing Denied:May 21, 2014

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Aug 19 2014 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 22, 2014)
Sep 19 2014 Brief of respondent BG Group plc in opposition filed.
Oct 3 2014 Reply of petitioner Republic of Argentina filed.
Oct 8 2014 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 31, 2014.
Nov 3 2014 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Matthew D. Slater Cleary, Gottlieb, Steen & Hamilton(202) 974-1500
    Counsel of Record2000 Pennsylvania Ave., N. W.
Washington, DC  20006
mslater@cgsh.com
Party name: Republic of Argentina
Attorneys for Respondent:
Alexander A. Yanos Hughes Hubbard & Reed, LLP(212) 299-6801
    Counsel of RecordOne Battery Park Plaza
New York, NY  10004
alex.yanos@hugheshubbard.com
Party name: BG Group plc

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543