Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results

        

Docket for 14-15
No. 14-15
Title:
Richard Armstrong, et al., Petitioners
v.
Exceptional Child Center, Inc., et al.
Docketed:July 7, 2014
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(12-35382)
  Decision Date:April 4, 2014
Questions Presented

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Jul 2 2014 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 6, 2014)
Jul 29 2014 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including September 5, 2014.
Aug 6 2014 Brief amici curiae of Texas, et al. filed.
Aug 27 2014 Brief of respondents Exceptional Child Center, Inc., et al. in opposition filed.
Sep 9 2014 Reply of petitioners Richard Armstrong, et al. filed.
Sep 10 2014 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 29, 2014.
Oct 2 2014 Petition GRANTED limited to Question 1 presented by the petition.
Nov 17 2014 Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Nov 17 2014 Brief of petitioners Richard Armstrong, et al. filed.
Nov 17 2014 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the petitioners.
Nov 19 2014 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the respondents.
Nov 21 2014 SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Tuesday, January 20, 2015
Nov 24 2014 Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Nov 24 2014 Brief amici curiae of Texas, et al. filed.
Nov 24 2014 Brief amici curiae of National Governors Association, et al. filed.
Nov 24 2014 Brief amicus curiae of California Health and Human Services Agency filed.
Dec 2 2014 Record requested from U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit.
Dec 2 2014 Record requested from U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit is electronic and located on PACER.
Dec 2 2014 Record from U.S.D.C. District of Idaho is electronic and located on PACER.
Dec 12 2014 CIRCULATED.
Dec 17 2014 Brief of respondents Exceptional Child Center, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Dec 18 2014 Brief amicus curiae of Medicaid Defense Fund filed. (Distributed)
Dec 19 2014 Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Dec 22 2014 Brief amici curiae of National Health Law Program, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Dec 22 2014 Brief amici curiae of American Civil Liberties Union, et al., filed. Distributed.
Dec 23 2014 Brief amici curiae of The American Network of Community Options and Resources, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Dec 23 2014 Brief amici curiae of The American Hospital Association, and Federation of American Hospitals filed. (Distributed)
Dec 23 2014 Brief amici curiae of Former HHS Officials filed. (Distributed).
Dec 23 2014 Brief amici curiae of American Medical Association, et al., filed. (Distributed)
Dec 23 2014 Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed. (Distributed)
Dec 24 2014 Brief amici curiae of Members of Congress filed. (Distributed)
Dec 24 2014 Brief amici curiae of American Association of People with Disabilities, et al., filed. (Distributed).
Dec 24 2014 Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed. (Distributed)
Jan 9 2015 Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Jan 13 2015 Reply of petitioners Richard Armstrong, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Jan 20 2015 Argued. For petitioners: Carl J. Withroe, Deputy Attorney General, Boise, Idaho; and Edwin S. Kneedler, Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.) For respondents: James M. Piotrowski, Boise, Idaho.
Mar 31 2015 Judgment REVERSED. Scalia, J., delivered the opinion of the Court with respect to Parts I, II, and III, in which Roberts, C. J., and Thomas, Breyer, and Alito, JJ., joined, and an opinion with respect to Part IV, in which Roberts, C. J., and Thomas and Alito, JJ., joined. Breyer, J., filed an opinion concurring in part and concurring in the judgment. Sotomayor, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Kennedy, Ginsburg, and Kagan, JJ., joined.
May 4 2015 JUDGMENT ISSUED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioners:
Carl J. Withroe Deputy Attorney General(208) 334-2400
    Counsel of Record Idaho Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 83720
Boise, ID  83720-0010
carl.withroe@ag.idaho.gov
Party name: Richard Armstrong, et al.
 
Brian P. Kane Assistant Chief Deputy Attorney General(208) 334-4523
Idaho Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 83720
Boise, ID  83720-0010
brian.kane@ag.idaho.gov
Party name: Richard Armstrong, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents:
James M. Piotrowski Herzfeld & Piotrowski, LLP(208) 331-9200
    Counsel of Record824 W. Franklin St.
Boise, ID  83702
james@idunionlaw.com
Party name: Exceptional Child Center, Inc., et al.
 
Stephen P. Berzon Altshuler Berzon LLP(415) 421-7151
177 Post Street, Suite 300
San Francisco, CA  94108
sberzon@altshulerberzon.com
Party name: Exceptional Child Center, Inc., et al.
 
Stacey M. Leyton Altshuler Berzon LLP(415)-421-7151
177 Post Street, Suite 300
San Francisco, CA  94108
sleyton@altshulerberzon.com
Party name: Exceptional Child Center, Inc., et al.
 
Matthew J Murray Altshuler Berzon LLP(415) 421-7151
177 Post Street, Suite 300
San Francisco, CA  94108
Party name: Exceptional Child Center, Inc., et al.
Other:
Gregory David Brown Deputy Solicitor General(415)-703-5461
455 Golden Gate Avenue
qSuite 11000
San Francisco, CA  94102-7004
gregory.brown@doj.ca.gov
Party name: California Health and Human Services Agency
 
Lynn S. Carman Medicaid Defense Fund(415) 927-4023
203A Picnic Ave.
San Rafael, CA  94901
lynnscarman@hotmail.com
Party name: Medicaid Defense Fund
 
Joel M. Hamme Powers Pyles Sutter & Verville, PC(202) 466-6550
Seventh Floor
1501 M Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20005
joel.hamme@ppsv.com
Party name: The American Network of Community Options and Resources, et al.
 
Edwin S. Kneedler Deputy Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
Party name: United States
 
Elizabeth B. McCallum Baker & Hostetler LLP(202) 861-1500
1050 Connecticut Ave., NW
Washington, DC  20034
emccallum@bakerlaw.com
Party name: American Association of People with Disabilities, et al.,
 
Michael W. McConnell Kirkland & Ellis LLP(202) 879-5000
655 Fifteenth Street, N.W., Suite 1200
Washington, DC  20005
michael.mcconnell@kirkland.com
Party name: National Governors Association, et al.
 
Jonathan F. Mitchell Solicitor General of Texas(512) 936-1695
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX  78711-2548
jonathan.mitchell@texasattorneygeneral.gov
Party name: Texas, et al.
 
Dominic F. Perella Hogan Lovells US LLP(202) 637-6452
555 Thirteenth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20004
dominic.perella@hoganlovells.com
Party name: The American Hospital Association, and Federation of American Hospitals
 
Martha Jane Perkins National Health Law Program (919)-968-6308
101 E. Weaver Street, #G7
Carrboro, NC  27510
perkins@healthlaw.org
Party name: National Health Law Program, et al.
 
Carter G. Phillips Sidley Austin LLP(202) 736-8270
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20005
cphillips@sidley.com
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
 
Steven R. Shapiro American Civil Liberties Union Foundation(212) 549-2500
125 Broad Street
New York, NY  10004
sshapiro@aclu.org
Party name: American Civil Liberties Union, et al.,
 
Stuart H. Singer Boies Schiller & Flexner LLP(954) 356-0011
401 East Las Olas Blvd.
Suite 1200
Fort Lauderdale, FL  3301
ssinger@bsfllp.com
Party name: American Medical Association, et al.,
 
Paul M. Smith Jenner & Block LLP(202) 639-6060
1099 New York Avenue, N.W., Suite 900
Washington, DC  20001
psmith@jenner.com
Party name: Members of Congress
 
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: United States
 
Stephen I. Vladeck 4801 Massachusetts Ave., N.W. (202)-274-4241
Washington, DC  20016
svladeck@wcl.american.edu
Party name: Former HHS Officials
 
Elizabeth B. Wydra Constitutional Accountability Center(202) 296-6889
1200 18th St., N.W., Suite 501
Washington, DC  20036
elizabeth@theusconstitution.org
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
August 25, 2016 | Version 2014.2