Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results

        

Docket for 14-1458
No. 14-1458
Title:
MHN Government Services, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Thomas Zaborowski, et al.
Docketed:June 12, 2015
Linked with 14A1031
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(13-15671)
  Decision Date:December 17, 2014
  Rehearing Denied:February 9, 2015
Questions Presented

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Apr 3 2015 Application (14A1031) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 10, 2015 to June 10, 2015, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Apr 8 2015 Application (14A1031) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until June 10, 2015.
Jun 10 2015 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 13, 2015)
Jul 1 2015 Waiver of right of respondents Thomas Zaborowski, et al. to respond filed.
Jul 10 2015 Brief amici curiae of Atlantic Legal Foundation, and The International Association of Defense Counsel filed.
Jul 13 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed. (Distributed)
Jul 13 2015 Brief amici curiae of Mary A. Bedikian, Daniel Barnhizer and George T. Roumell, Jr. filed. (Distributed)
Jul 15 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 28, 2015.
Jul 23 2015 Response Requested . (Due August 24, 2015)
Aug 24 2015 Brief of respondents Thomas Zaborowski, et al. in opposition filed.
Sep 8 2015 Reply of petitioners MHN Government Services, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Sep 9 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 28, 2015.
Oct 1 2015 Petition GRANTED.
Oct 23 2015 The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including November 25, 2015.
Oct 23 2015 The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including January 8, 2016.
Nov 2 2015 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs in support of either party or of neither party received from counsel for the respondents.
Nov 5 2015 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs in support of either party or of neither party received from counsel for the petitioners.
Nov 25 2015 Joint appendix filed.
Nov 25 2015 Brief of petitioners MHN Government Services, Inc., et al. filed.
Dec 2 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Equal Employment Advisory Council filed.
Dec 2 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Dec 2 2015 Brief amicus curiae of The Employers Group filed.
Dec 2 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed.
Dec 2 2015 Brief amici curiae of Atlantic Legal Foundation, and The International Association of Defense Counsel filed.
Dec 2 2015 Brief amicus curiae of DRI - The Voice of the Defense Bar filed.
Dec 23 2015 SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, February 24, 2016
Dec 30 2015 The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is further extended to and including January 15, 2016.
Jan 7 2016 Letter from counsel for the petitioners received.
Jan 7 2016 CASE REMOVED FROM ARGUMENT CALENDAR for Wednesday, February 24, 2016.
Apr 8 2016 Motion to dismiss the writ of certiorari pursuant to Rule 46 received.
Apr 11 2016 Letter of consent to the motion to dismiss the writ of certiorari pursuant to Rule 46 received.
Apr 12 2016 Petition Dismissed - Rule 46.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioners:
Robert Mark Loeb Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP(202) 339-8400
    Counsel of Record1152 15th Street, NW
Washington, DC  20005
rloeb@orrick.com
Party name: MHN Government Services, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents:
Thomas C. Goldstein Goldstein & Russell, P.C.(202) 362-0636
    Counsel of Record7475 Wisconsin Ave.
Suite 850
Bethesda, MD  20814
tg@goldsteinrussell.com
Party name: Thomas Zaborowski, et al.
 
Jahan C. Sagafi Outten & Golden, LLP(415) 638-8800
One Embarcadero Center, 38th Floor
San Francisco, CA  94111
jsagafi@outtengolden.com
Party name: Thomas Zaborowski, et al.
Other:
David M. Axelrad Horvitz & Levy LLP(818) 995-0800
15760 Ventura Boulevard
18th Floor
Encino, CA  91436-3000
daxelrad@horvitzlevy.com
Party name: DRI - The Voice of the Defense Bar
 
Theane Evangelis Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP(213) 229-7078
333 South Grand Avenue
Los Angeles, CA  90071
tevangelis@gibsondunn.com
Party name: The Employers Group
 
Martin S. Kaufman Atlantic Legal Foundation(914) 834-3322
2039 Palmer Avenue #104
Larchmont, NY  10538
mskaufman@atlanticlegal.org
Party name: Atlantic Legal Foundation, and The International Association of Defense Counsel
 
Deborah J. La Fetra Pacific Legal Foundation(916) 419-7111
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA  95814
dlafetra@pacificlegal.org
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation
 
Thomas M. Peterson Morgan Lewis & Bockius, LLP(415) 442-1000
One Market Street,
Spear Street Tower
San Francisco, CA  94105-1596
tmpeterson@morganlewis.com
Party name: Mary A. Bedikian, Daniel Barnhizer and George T. Roumell, Jr.
 
Andrew J. Pincus Mayer Brown LLP(202) 263-3127
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC  20006-1101
apincus@mayerbrown.com
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
 
Rae T. Vann NT Lakis, LLP(202) 629-5600
1501 M Street, N.W., Suite 400
Washington, DC  20005
rvann@ntlakis.com
Party name: Equal Employment Advisory Council
February 26, 2017 | Version 2014.2