Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 14-1263
No. 14-1263
Title:
Jonathan Corbett, Petitioner
v.
Transportation Security Administration
Docketed:April 22, 2015
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
  Case Nos.:(12-15893-RR)
  Decision Date:September 19, 2014
  Rehearing Denied:December 5, 2014

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Mar 4 2015 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 22, 2015)
May 1 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Freedom to Travel USA filed.
May 22 2015 Waiver of right of respondent Transportation Security Administration to respond filed.
Jun 2 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 18, 2015.
Jun 22 2015 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Jonathan Corbett 382 N.E. 191st Street # 86952(305) 600-0410
Miami, FL  33179
jon@professional-troublemaker.com
Party name: Jonathan Corbett
Attorneys for Respondent:
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
    Counsel of Record United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: Transportation Security Administration
Other:
Emily Marie Robison Adams Adams Legal LLC801-309-9625
1310 Madera Hills Drive
Bountiful, UT  84010
eadams@adamslegalllc.com
Party name: Freedom to Travel USA
March 26, 2017 | Version 2014.2