Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 14-1252
No. 14-1252
Title:
City of San Jose, California, et al., Petitioners
v.
Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, et al.
Docketed:April 17, 2015
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(14-15139)
  Decision Date:January 15, 2015

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Apr 15 2015 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 18, 2015)
Apr 24 2015 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including June 17, 2015.
Jun 17 2015 Brief of respondents Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, et al. in opposition filed.
Jun 30 2015 Reply of petitioners City of San Jose, et al. filed. (Distributed).
Jul 1 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 28, 2015.
Oct 5 2015 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioners:
Joseph W. Cotchett Cotchett, Pitre & McCarthy(650) 697-6000
    Counsel of Record840 Malcolm Road
Burlingame, CA  94010
jcotchett@cpmlegal.com
Party name: City of San Jose, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents:
John W. Keker Keker & Van Nest LLP(415) 391-5400
    Counsel of Record633 Battery Street
San Francisco, CA  94111-1809
jjkeker@kvn.com
Party name: Office of the Commissioner of Baseball, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543