Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results

        

Docket for 14-1168
No. 14-1168
Title:
Roger L. Smith, Petitioner
v.
Aegon Companies Pension Plan
Docketed:March 24, 2015
Linked with 14A682
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(13-5492)
  Decision Date:October 14, 2014

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Dec 22 2014 Application (14A682) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 12, 2015 to February 11, 2015, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Dec 29 2014 Application (14A682) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until February 11, 2015.
Jan 27 2015 Application (14A682) to extend further the time from February 11, 2015 to March 13, 2015, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Jan 30 2015 Application (14A682) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until March 13, 2015.
Mar 13 2015 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 23, 2015)
Apr 23 2015 Brief of respondent Aegon Companies Pension Plan in opposition filed.
May 11 2015 Reply of petitioner Roger L. Smith filed. (Distributed)
May 12 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 28, 2015.
Jun 1 2015 The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
Nov 25 2015 Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Dec 3 2015 Supplemental brief of respondent in response to amicus curiae brief of the United States filed.
Dec 8 2015 Supplemental brief of petitioner Roger L. Smith filed. (Distributed)
Dec 9 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 8, 2016.
Jan 11 2016 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Matthew W.H. Wessler Gupta Wessler PLLC(202) 888-1741
    Counsel of Record1735 20th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20009
matt@guptawessler.com
Party name: Roger L. Smith
Attorneys for Respondent:
David Robert Levin Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP(202) 230-5181
    Counsel of Record1500 K Street, NW
Washington, DC  20006
david.levin@dbr.com
Party name: Aegon Companies Pension Plan
Other:
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: United States
July 26, 2016 | Version 2014.1