Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 14-1139
No. 14-1139
Title:
Estate of Adam Brown, Petitioner
v.
Timothy Thomas, et al.
Docketed:March 18, 2015
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
  Case Nos.:(14-1867)
  Decision Date:November 13, 2014
  Rehearing Denied:December 15, 2014

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Mar 16 2015 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 17, 2015)
Apr 16 2015 Brief of respondents Timothy Thomas, et al. in opposition filed.
Apr 24 2015 Reply of petitioner Estate of Adam Brown filed.
May 5 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 21, 2015.
May 26 2015 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Kenneth Chesebro 1600 Massachusetts Ave.(617) 661-4423
    Counsel of RecordNo. 801
Cambridge, MA  02138
kenchesebro@msn.com
Party name: Estate of Adam Brown
Attorneys for Respondents:
Samuel C. Hall Jr. Crivello Carlson, S.C.(414) 271-7722
    Counsel of Record710 N. Plankinton Ave., Suite 500
Milwaukee, WI  53203
shall@crivellocarlson.com
Party name: Timothy Thomas, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543