Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results

        

Docket for 14-1091
No. 14-1091
Title:
Dow Chemical Company, Petitioner
v.
Industrial Polymers, Inc., et al.
Docketed:March 10, 2015
Linked with 14A665
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(13-3215)
  Decision Date:September 29, 2014
  Rehearing Denied:November 7, 2014

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Dec 17 2014 Application (14A665) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 5, 2015 to March 9, 2015, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Dec 22 2014 Application (14A665) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until March 9, 2015.
Mar 9 2015 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 9, 2015)
Mar 12 2015 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the respondents.
Mar 12 2015 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the petitioner.
Mar 25 2015 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including May 11, 2015.
Apr 8 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Product Liability Advisory Council, Inc. filed.
Apr 8 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Apr 9 2015 Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed.
Apr 9 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Atlantic Legal Foundation filed.
Apr 9 2015 Brief amicus curiae of DRI - The Voice of the Defense Bar filed.
Apr 9 2015 Brief amici curiae of Professors Kevin M. Murphy, et al. filed.
May 11 2015 Brief of respondents Industrial Polymers, Inc., et al. in opposition filed.
May 22 2015 Reply of petitioner Dow Chemical Company filed. (Distributed)
May 26 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 11, 2015.
Jun 15 2015 Emergency Joint Motion to Hold Petition in Abeyance Before Release of the Orders List filed.
Jun 15 2015 Motion withdrawn by the parties
Feb 25 2016 Joint motion to hold petition in abeyance filed by petitioner Dow Chemical Company and respondents Industrial Polymers, Inc., et al.
Feb 29 2016 Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 4, 2016.
Mar 7 2016 Joint motion to hold petition in abeyance GRANTED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Carter G. Phillips Sidley Austin LLP(202) 736-8000
    Counsel of Record1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20005
cphillips@sidley.com
Party name: Dow Chemical Company
Attorneys for Respondents:
Cory L. Andrews Washington Legal Foundation(202)-588-0302
2009 Massachusetts Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20036
candrews@wlf.org
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
 
Paul D. Clement Bancroft PLLC(202) 234-0090
500 New Jersey Ave., NW
Seventh Floor
Washington, DC  20001
pclement@bancroftpllc.com
Party name: Industrial Polymers, Inc., et al.
Other:
John H. Beisner Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP(202) 371-7000
1440 New York Avenue, NW
Washington, DC  20005
John.Beisner@skadden.com
Party name: Product Liability Advisory Council, Inc.
 
Lawrence S. Ebner Dentons US LLP(202) 496-7500
1900 K Street NW
Washington, DC  20006
lawrence.ebner@dentons.com
Party name: DRI - The Voice of the Defense Bar
 
Steffen N. Johnson Winston & Strawn LLP(202) 282-5000
1700 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20006
sjohnson@winston.com
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al.
 
Martin S. Kaufman Atlantic Legal Foundation(914) 834-3322
2039 Palmer Avenue #104
Larchmont, NY  10538
mskaufman@atlanticlegal.org
Party name: Atlantic Legal Foundation
 
Christopher Landau Kirkland & Ellis LLP(202) 879-5000
655 Fifteenth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20005
clandau@kirkland.com
Party name: Professors Kevin M. Murphy, et al.
August 24, 2016 | Version 2014.2