Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 14-10427
No. 14-10427
Title:
Manuel Arzola, Petitioner
v.
Massachusetts
Docketed:June 25, 2015
Linked with 14A1130
Lower Ct:Supreme Judicial Court of Massachusetts
  Case Nos.:(SJC-11679)
  Decision Date:March 4, 2015

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
May 5 2015 Application (14A1130) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 2, 2015 to July 2, 2015, submitted to Justice Breyer.
May 6 2015 Application (14A1130) granted by Justice Breyer extending the time to file until July 2, 2015.
Jun 22 2015 Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 27, 2015)
Jul 23 2015 Waiver of right of respondent Massachusetts to respond filed.
Jul 27 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Maryland Public Defender filed.
Aug 13 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 28, 2015.
Sep 2 2015 Response Requested . (Due October 2, 2015)
Sep 25 2015 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 20, 2015.
Nov 20 2015 Brief of respondent Massachusetts in opposition filed.
Dec 1 2015 Reply of petitioner Manuel Arzola filed.
Dec 10 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 8, 2016.
Jan 11 2016 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Katherine C. Essington 190 Broad Street(401) 351-2889
    Counsel of RecordSuite 3W
Providence, RI  02903
katyessington@me.com
Party name: Manuel Arzola
Attorneys for Respondent:
Christopher Hurld Assistant Attorney General(617) 963-2630
    Counsel of Record One Ashburton Place
Boston, MA  02108
christopher.hurld@state.ma.us
Party name: Massachusetts
 
Randall Evan Ravitz Assistant Attorney General(617) 963-2852
Massachusetts Attorney General's Office
One Ashburton Place
Boston, MA  02108
randall.ravitz@state.ma.us
Party name: Massachusetts
Other:
Stephen B. Mercer Chief Attorney, Forensics Division(410) 767-5541
Office of the Public Defender
6 Saint Paul St.
Suite 1400
Baltimore, MD  21202
smercer@opd.state.md.us
Party name: Maryland Public Defender

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543