Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 14-10311
No. 14-10311     *** CAPITAL CASE ***  
Title:
William Eugene Hall, Petitioner
v.
Tennessee
Docketed:June 22, 2015
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Tennessee, Middle Division
  Case Nos.:(M2012-00336-SC-DDTDD)
  Decision Date:March 20, 2015

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Jun 16 2015 Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 22, 2015)
Jul 28 2015 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 21, 2015.
Oct 7 2015 Brief of respondent Tennessee in opposition filed.
Oct 22 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 6, 2015.
Nov 9 2015 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Patrick T. McNally Weatherly, McNally & Dixon, PLC(615) 986-3377
Suite 2600 Fifth Third Center
424 Church Street
Nashville, TN  37219
pmcnally@wmdlawgroup.com
Party name: William Eugene Hall
Attorneys for Respondent:
James E. Gaylord Assistant Attorney General(615) 532-7356
Office of the Tennessee Attorney General
P.O. Box 20207
Nashville, TN  37202-0207
jim.gaylord@ag.tn.gov
Party name: Tennessee

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543