Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 14-1005
No. 14-1005
Title:
Security Health Care, L.L.C., dba Grace Living Center - Norman, et al., Petitioners
v.
Johnnie Boler, Personal Representative of the Estate of Cleo Boler
Docketed:February 19, 2015
Linked with 14A495
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Oklahoma
  Case Nos.:(111775)
  Decision Date:September 30, 2014

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Nov 5 2014 Application (14A495) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 29, 2014 to February 12, 2015, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Nov 7 2014 Application (14A495) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until February 12, 2015.
Feb 11 2015 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 23, 2015)
Feb 26 2015 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including April 22, 2015.
Apr 22 2015 Brief of respondent Johnnie Boler, Personal Representative of the Estate of Cleo Boler in opposition filed.
May 7 2015 Reply of petitioners Security Health Care, L.L.C., dba Grace Living Center - Norman, et al. filed.
May 12 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 28, 2015.
Jun 1 2015 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioners:
Harvey D. Ellis Jr. Braniff Building(405) 235-7700
    Counsel of Record324 North Robinson Ave.
Suite100
Oklahoma City, OK  73102
harvey.ellis@crowedunlevy.com
Party name: Security Health Care, L.L.C., dba Grace Living Center - Norman, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent:
John Vail John Vail Law PLLC(202) 589-1300
    Counsel of Record777 Sixth Street, NW, Suite 410
Washington, DC  20001
john@johnvaillaw.com
Party name: Johnnie Boler, Personal Representative of the Estate of Cleo Boler
June 25, 2017 | Version 2014.2