Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 14-10009
No. 14-10009     *** CAPITAL CASE ***  
Title:
Ashford L. Thompson, Petitioner
v.
Ohio
Docketed:June 1, 2015
Linked with 14A1092
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Ohio
  Case Nos.:(2010-1373)
  Decision Date:October 29, 2014
  Rehearing Denied:January 28, 2015

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Apr 24 2015 Application (14A1092) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 28, 2015 to May 28, 2015, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Apr 27 2015 Application (14A1092) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until May 28, 2015.
May 28 2015 Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 1, 2015)
Jun 23 2015 Brief of respondent Ohio in opposition filed.
Jul 9 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 28, 2015.
Sep 11 2015 Reply of petitioner Ashford L. Thompson filed. (Distributed)
Oct 5 2015 Petition DENIED.
Oct 30 2015 Petition for Rehearing filed.
Nov 4 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 24, 2015.
Nov 30 2015 Rehearing DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Rachel Troutman Office of the Ohio Public Defender(614)-466-5394
    Counsel of Record250 East Broad Street Suite 1400
Columbus, OH  43215
rachel.troutman@opd.ohio.gov
Party name: Ashford L. Thompson
Attorneys for Respondent:
Richard S. Kasay Summit County Prosecuting Atty.(330) 643-8340
    Counsel of Record53 University Avenue, 6th Floor
Akron, OH  44308
kasay@prosecutor.summitoh.net
Party name: Ohio

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543