Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 13A1199
No. 13A1199
Title:
NACS, fka National Association of Convenience Stores, et al., Applicant
v.
Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System
Docketed:June 3, 2014
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
  Case Nos.:(13-5270)

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
May 30 2014 Application (13A1199) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 19, 2014 to July 21, 2014, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Jun 4 2014 Application (13A1199) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until July 21, 2014.
Jul 7 2014 Application (13A1199) to extend further the time from July 21, 2014 to August 18, 2014, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Jul 9 2014 Application (13A1199) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until August 18, 2014.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioners:
Shannen Wayne Coffin Steptoe & Johnson LLP(202)-429-6255
1330 Connecticut Avenue NW
Washington, DC  20036
Party name: NACS, fka National Association of Convenience Stores, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent:
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
Party name: Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543