Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results

        

Docket for 13A1174
No. 13A1174
Title:
Patrick Bainter, et al., Applicants
v.
League of Women Voters of Florida, et al.
Docketed:May 28, 2014
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Florida
  Case Nos.:(SC14-987)

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
May 28 2014 Application (13A1174) for a stay pending the filing and disposition of a petition for a writ of certiorari, submitted to Justice Thomas.
May 30 2014 Letter of May 30, 2014, from counsel for the applicants received withdrawing the application (13A1174) for stay.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioners:
D. Kent Safriet Hopping Green & Sams, P.A.(850) 222-7500
119 South Monroe Street, Suite 300
Tallahassee, FL  32301
Party name: Patrick Bainter, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents:
David B. King 25 E. Pine Street / P.O. Box 1631(407)-422-2472
Orlando, FL  32802-1631
Party name: League of Women Voters of Florida, et al.
March 22, 2017 | Version 2014.2